CENTRE OF HOPE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing food and meals for the poor. Playground for children. Toiletries and showers. Assistance with medication. Spiritual help and guidance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Romania
- Scotland
Governance
- 27 October 2003: Standard registration
- CENTRE OF HOPE - GLIA (Working name)
- GLIA (Working name)
- GOD'S LOVE IN ACTION (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Ronald Briscoe | Chair | 08 January 2014 |
|
|||||
ANITA CLAIRE HILLMAN | Trustee | 21 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
PETER STUART BUTCHER | Trustee | 13 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS AVERY HILLMAN trustee | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GILL MARTIN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.41k | £81.02k | £98.18k | £87.19k | £59.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.46k | £79.75k | £76.02k | £89.42k | £94.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/09/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/12/2012
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH 3 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
93 Clifton Road
Lossiemouth
IV31 6DP
- Phone:
- 01343810748
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window