Financial history LIVERPOOL MOZART ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 1100591
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £11.51k £458 £8.88k £16.83k £17.24k
Total expenditure £7.76k £432 £8.10k £12.68k £14.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A