YSGOL ESTYN HOME SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1100826
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The main principle is that parents, staff and friends of the school all work together for the good of everyone in the school. Much of what we do is raise funds which will be spent to benefit the school.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 22 September 2023

Total income: £4,400
Total expenditure: £3,100

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Flintshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 November 2003: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Georgina Henry Chair 03 September 2018
HOPE PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP
Received: On time
William Thomas Trustee 10 September 2020
None on record
Barbara Jones Trustee 10 September 2015
1st Hope Scouts Group
Received: On time
Gareth Huw Ellis Trustee 10 September 2015
None on record
GARETH DAVID JONES Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 22/09/2019 22/09/2020 22/09/2021 22/09/2022 22/09/2023
Total gross income £9.27k £3.53k £3.10k £3.40k £4.40k
Total expenditure £11.12k £1.95k £2.15k £2.00k £3.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 22 September 2023 22 October 2024 92 days late
Accounts and TAR 22 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 22 September 2022 20 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 22 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 22 September 2021 18 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 22 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 22 September 2020 11 August 2021 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 22 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 22 September 2019 23 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 22 September 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
YSGOL ESTYN
HAWARDEN ROAD
HOPE
WREXHAM
LL12 9NL
Phone:
01978760501
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available