Financial history ADVANCE HE

Charity number: 1101607
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £14.42m £15.29m £15.97m £17.36m £19.19m
Total expenditure £12.73m £13.72m £27.05m £16.83m £10.00m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £770.00k £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £13.48m £14.49m £15.93m £17.08m £18.64m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £54.00k £34.00k £37.00k £283.00k £555.00k
Income - Other £888.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £12.73m £13.72m £15.82m £16.83m £10.00m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £34.00k £37.00k £0 £57.00k £47.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £11.24m £0 £0