RINA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is involved in philanthropic activities and gives support to Educational and Other Charitable Institutions both in Great Britain and abroad.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Barnet
- Gateshead
- Hackney
- Haringey
Governance
- 20 February 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUZANNE NAOMI JANE LEBRETT | Trustee |
|
||||||
DAVID GOLDBERG | Trustee |
|
||||||
LINDA KAREN GOLDBERG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £313.19k | £182.08k | £385.97k | £300.48k | £343.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £190.66k | £143.27k | £254.28k | £198.38k | £329.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 7 OCTOBER 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 3 FEBRUARY 2004
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT AND FURTHERANCE OF THE JEWISH RELIGION AND JEWISH RELIGIOUS EDUCATION AND THE ALLEVIATION OF POVERTY AMONG THE JEWISH COMMUNITY THROUGHOUT THE WORLD. OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES THAT THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 QUEENS GARDENS
LONDON
NW4 2TR
- Phone:
- 02087310777
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window