Financial history FULCRUM-ANGLICAN

Charity number: 1102069
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £1.04k £1.03k £1.17k £1.12k £1.12k
Total expenditure £2.07k £565 £1.06k £1.50k £1.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A