THE MAUSOLEA AND MONUMENTS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Protecting and Preserving mausolea and monuments within the UK
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 November 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN ALBERT JOHNSON | Chair |
|
||||||||
Nigel Hankin | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|||||||
Dr Elizabeth Jane Blood | Trustee | 11 August 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Matthew John Saunders MBE | Trustee | 28 October 2021 |
|
|||||||
John Arthur Annesley Goodall | Trustee | 22 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Katherine Anne Teresa Davey | Trustee | 22 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Michael Fox | Trustee | 22 November 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Thomas David Drysdale | Trustee | 07 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
TIM SIMON IAN ELLIS | Trustee | 24 June 2012 |
|
|
||||||
ALEXANDER BAGNALL | Trustee | 24 June 2012 |
|
|
||||||
CHARLES PATRICK WAGNER | Trustee |
|
||||||||
ROBERT HENRY HEATHCOTE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.73k | £29.24k | £21.98k | £20.93k | £9.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.28k | £45.35k | £29.75k | £17.30k | £9.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 JUNE 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/06/2015
Charitable objects
TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC MAUSOLEA AND MONUMENTS SITUATED WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
BELFRY HOUSE
OLD LANE
DOCKENFIELD
FARNHAM
GU10 4HQ
- Phone:
- 07517082846
- Email:
- info@mmtrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window