CRYING OUT LOUD

Charity number: 1101496
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Crying Out Loud produces, commissions and programmes contemporary dance, circus, music and performance for audiences of all ages, working with UK and international artists both in the UK and abroad. Everything we do is educational in the broadest aspect of the term.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £337,398
Total expenditure: £351,903

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 January 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CATHERINE HARRISON Chair 03 May 2012
None on record
Amanda O'Reilly Trustee 05 October 2024
None on record
Anna Potten Trustee 08 May 2024
SOUTH HAMPSHIRE REFORM JEWISH COMMUNITY
Received: On time
THE SOUTH HAMPSHIRE JEWISH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Recently registered
Andrea Sheppard Trustee 08 May 2024
None on record
Susan Mary Daniels Trustee 03 November 2020
None on record
Tracey Low Trustee 22 July 2015
None on record
MICHAEL CHRISTOPHER BRINTON Trustee 22 April 2013
None on record
Mark Kowalik Trustee 03 May 2012
None on record
BILLY RIDGERS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £373.22k £248.63k £371.65k £322.68k £337.40k
Total expenditure £327.24k £241.37k £344.45k £332.50k £351.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £211.22k £215.10k £215.19k £219.10k £307.99k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 06 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 06 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 29 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 17 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
VENTURE HOUSE
THE TANNERIES
EAST STREET
TITCHFIELD
Hampshire
PO14 4AR
Phone:
02076507954