Financial history RAYS OF SUNSHINE

Charity number: 1102529
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £5.09m £1.49m £4.32m £2.29m £2.07m
Total expenditure £4.49m £1.66m £2.73m £3.37m £3.46m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £2.42k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.30m £1.00m £4.07m £1.66m £1.07m
Income - Other trading activities £1.43m £93.14k £87.95k £53.78k £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.35m £266.27k £152.52k £567.79k £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £14.67k £10.65k £2.96k £11.33k £15.68k
Income - Other £0 £116.97k £2.42k £27 £983.45k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £2.50k £13.15k £69.74k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.51m £1.13m £2.09m £2.42m £2.80m
Expenditure - Raising funds £979.39k £526.40k £641.20k £947.50k £661.14k
Expenditure - Governance £120.19k £23.33k £29.88k £86.69k £40.64k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £20.00k £18.48k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £6.05k £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0