Financial history THE CHRISTIE ARCHIVE TRUST

Charity Number: 1102677
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £21.46k £24.02k £4.92k £49.08k £8.40k
Total expenditure £14.55k £27.58k £16.56k £19.87k £22.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A