BRISTOL BAPTIST COLLEGE

Charity number: 1102280
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Delivering religious education and training to those preparing for Ministry (generally but not exclusively in the Baptist denomination), to others furthering their theological education and to those preparing for service in Children, Families and Youth Ministry (both Christian and secular based). Providing a Christian resource centre for study and development.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 February 2004: Standard registration
  • 26 November 2017: Funds received from 1116341 TWERTON FELLOWSHIP
  • 06 April 2022: Funds received from 233150 CALEB BAILEY'S CHARITY
  • 25 October 2024: Funds received from 1073527 CREED'S BRISTOL BAPTIST COLLEGE CHARITY
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
TIMOTHY JOHN WALKER Trustee 07 November 2024
THE ALBEMARLE LIMITED
Received: On time
RETIRED BAPTIST MINISTERS HOUSING ORGANISATION
Received: On time
RBMHO TRUST CORPORATION LIMITED
Received: On time
THE BAPTIST UNION CORPORATION LIMITED
Received: On time
SOUTH WEST BAPTIST TRUST CORPORATION
Received: On time
Rev Kenneth Leonard Benjamin Trustee 22 April 2024
None on record
Rev Tania Jane Vaughan Trustee 19 February 2024
None on record
Rev Peter Thomas Henderson Hatton Trustee 19 February 2024
BRISTOL BAPTIST FUND
Received: On time
BRISTOL AND SOUTH GLOUCESTERSHIRE CIRCUIT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Rev Peter John Morden Trustee 01 August 2023
BRISTOL BAPTIST FUND
Received: On time
Rachel Elizabeth Mary Stone Trustee 02 May 2023
None on record
Rev STEPHEN LEONARD COPSON Trustee 15 February 2023
REGENT'S PARK COLLEGE
Received: On time
THE BAPTIST HISTORICAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
DR DANIEL WILLIAMS (COMMONLY KNOWN AS DR WILLIAMS'S TRUST)
Received: 51 days late
Rev Michael James Peat Trustee 19 October 2020
None on record
Graham John Lewis Trustee 11 September 2019
TYNDALE BAPTIST CHURCH, BRISTOL
Received: On time
TYNDALE CIRCLE DAY CENTRE
Received: On time
BLOC PRODUCTIONS
Received: On time
Dorette Morgan Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Rev Matthew George Bradley Trustee 15 October 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £448.09k £504.93k £591.16k £436.16k £684.78k
Total expenditure £599.37k £511.11k £616.06k £735.26k £711.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £3.37k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £96.06k £152.06k N/A £123.90k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £179 £798 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £289.05k £312.26k N/A £298.71k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A £119.64k £124.11k N/A £212.66k
Income - Other N/A £9 £1.93k N/A £49.51k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £10.00k N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £493.41k £597.82k N/A £695.50k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £17.70k £18.24k N/A £15.70k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £5.79k £6.32k N/A £11.46k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £15.89k £15.82k N/A £12.77k
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 N/A £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Own use assets N/A £3.05m £3.30m N/A £3.19m
Long-term investments N/A £2.62m £2.33m N/A £2.21m
Other assets N/A £297.76k £274.19k N/A £236.46k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A -£195.49k -£169.94k N/A £0
Total liabilities N/A £39.05k £46.84k N/A £63.39k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 27 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 27 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 01 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 01 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 24 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 24 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 19 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 22 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 16 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 16 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
BRISTOL BAPTIST COLLEGE
DUNCAN HOUSE
THE PROMENADE
CLIFTON DOWN
BRISTOL
BS8 3NJ
Phone:
01179467050