POSTAL HERITAGE COLLECTION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educational charity working to make the Royal Mail Archive and the Postal Heritage Trust collection accessible as widely as possible.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 February 2004: Standard registration
- THE BRITISH POSTAL MUSEUM & ARCHIVE (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Jane Wilkinson | Chair | 14 December 2023 |
|
|||||||
Nicola Jane Koppelmann | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|||||||
Rachel Georgina Kuhn | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|||||||
Ailbhe Mary McNabola | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|||||||
Daniel Richard Wolfe | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|||||||
Mark Rowan Amsden | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|||||||
Laura Anne Wright | Trustee | 25 June 2018 |
|
|||||||
Peter Ewart Walls | Trustee | 02 March 2018 |
|
|||||||
Susan Claire Raikes | Trustee | 18 January 2017 |
|
|||||||
Mike Russell | Trustee | 12 May 2015 |
|
|||||||
David Gold | Trustee | 20 January 2014 |
|
|||||||
JULIAN BARKER | Trustee | 17 March 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.88k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/09/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/02/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21/10/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/11/2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (THE "OBJECTS") ARE:- 3.1.1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC PARTICULARLY IN THE HISTORY OF POSTAL COMMUNICATION AND RELATED SERVICES AND OF THE ACTIVITIES OF THE BRITISH POST OFFICE AND ITS SUCCESSORS AND THE POSTAL AND COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS WORLDWIDE; 3.1.2 TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN MUSEUM(S) AND/OR ARCHIVE(S) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, AND IN PURSUIT OF THAT OBJECT; (A) COLLECT ARTEFACTS AND ARCHIVES INCLUDING POSTAL ARTEFACTS AND ARCHIVES WHICH MAY BE BRITISH OR INTERNATIONAL TO A PUBLISHED POLICY AGREED BY THE CHARITY; (B) MANAGE, DOCUMENT, CONSERVE AND SAFEGUARD THE NATIONAL POSTAL COLLECTIONS AND OTHER COLLECTIONS AND HOLDINGS TO THE HIGHEST APPROPRIATE PROFESSIONAL STANDARDS; (C) EXHIBIT, INTERPRET AND PROVIDE ACCESS TO THE COLLECTIONS. 3.1.3 RESTORE, EXHIBIT AND PRESERVE OBJECTS, (INCLUDING VEHICLES AND WHERE APPROPRIATE BUILDINGS AND OTHER STRUCTURES) PARTICULARLY THOSE OBJECTS ASSOCIATED WITH THE HISTORY OF POSTAL AND RELATED SERVICES AND THE ACTIVITIES OF THE BRITISH POST OFFICE AND ITS SUCCESSORS; 3.1.4 TO UNDERTAKE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Postal Museum
Calthorpe House
15-20 Phoenix Place
LONDON
WC1X 0DA
- Phone:
- 03000300700
- Email:
- info@postalmuseum.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window