Trustees FACING HISTORY AND OURSELVES
Charity Number: 1103592

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Lynn Schmidt Whiddington CBE | Trustee | 02 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Hiral Kelly | Trustee | 02 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rudi Alastair Eliott Lockhart | Trustee | 02 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Seton | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Mark Robert Echlin | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rapheal Eleazar Offer | Trustee | 19 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Iman Louise Pyne-Jones | Trustee | 19 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anne-Marie Fitzgerald | Trustee | 14 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rita Susan Halbright | Trustee | 25 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Judy Wise | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.