Financial history THE FRIENDS OF WORCESTERS PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1102598
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.65k £129 £1.62k £2.07k £6.43k
Total expenditure £3.77k £1.62k £471 £2.57k £4.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A