GLOUCESTERSHIRE NIGHTSTOP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Gloucestershire Nightstop works with young single homeless people aged 16 - 25 throughout the County of Gloucestershire. The charity provides emergency and temporary accommodation in the homes of trained and approved 'hosts'. day stop one to one and peer support,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £45,500 from 5 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
31 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 01 April 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patricia Anne le Rolland | Chair | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Rupert Cox | Trustee | 18 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Coventry | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Lucas-Mouat | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Zachary Jacob Arnold | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.08k | £145.69k | £137.07k | £136.15k | £217.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £131.54k | £121.59k | £173.44k | £221.47k | £279.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £21.00k | £18.00k | £15.50k | £62.50k | £45.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 JULY 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 20 NOVEMBER 2007 AND 1 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED ARE WITHIN THE COUNTY OF GLOUCESTER AND ITS ENVIRONS ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT"): 1. TO PROMOTE ALL OR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF HOMELESS YOUNG PEOPLE WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND IN PARTICULAR THE PROVISION OF EMERGENCY ACCOMMODATION IN THE HOMES OF VOLUNTEERS. 2. BY EDUCATION TRAINING AND OTHERWISE TO ADVANCE THE AWARENESS OF MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC INTO THE EXPERIENCE AND NEEDS OF YOUNG HOMELESS PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
THE COUNTY OF GLOUCESTERSHIRE AND ITS ENVIRONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Ladybellegate Street
GLOUCESTER
GL1 2HN
- Phone:
- 01452331330
- Email:
- manager@glosns.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window