CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU IN SWALE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of free, confidential, independent and impartial advice services to the people of Swale.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £162,817 from 4 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 02 April 2004: Standard registration
- 27 March 2020: Funds received from 1140926 KENT AND MEDWAY CITIZENS ADVICE
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pam Kenworthy | Chair | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Cuffley | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katie Gough | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Edwards | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brett Appleton | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elliott Jayes | Trustee | 25 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Kieran Golding | Trustee | 25 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barrie Neaves | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Perkin | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £355.71k | £364.05k | £404.14k | £459.17k | £434.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £310.50k | £343.80k | £431.49k | £459.12k | £462.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £163.43k | £161.39k | £195.93k | £183.46k | £162.82k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23 FEB 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09 SEP 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05 NOV 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN SWALE AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Area of benefit
SWALE, KENT AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Citizens Advice Swale
Swale House
East Street
Sittingbourne
Kent
ME10 3HT
- Phone:
- 01795417666
- Email:
- admin@citizensadviceswale.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window