EVESHAM VOLUNTEER CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community Car Scheme, Shopping Service, Befriending Scheme, Lunch Clubs, Social Clubs, Information Service. Recruit, advise and guide those willing to undertake voluntary work and to be a focal point for voluntary and statutory organisations who use volunteers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £34,972 from 3 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 23 April 2004: Standard registration
- VALE OF EVESHAM VOLUNTEER CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARBARA FORD | Chair | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Scurfield | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Clatworthy | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Martin John Ashplant | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Trevor Roland Battersby | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Newbury | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Malcolm Woodcock | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anne Evans | Trustee | 06 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT RAPHAEL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.32k | £84.74k | £152.99k | £84.17k | £97.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.36k | £66.40k | £97.51k | £118.34k | £138.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £20.36k | N/A | £25.30k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £13.85k | N/A | £71.00k | £25.30k | £34.97k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 March 2024 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 March 2024 | 55 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 February 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 February 2022 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM & ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 01/03/2004 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 27/04/2006 BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 20/05/2010 AND BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 01/06/2010
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, PRINCIPALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE VALE OF EVESHAM AND ITS ENVIRONS (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE "AREA OF BENEFIT") AND, IN PARTICULAR UNDERTAKE VOLUNTARY WORK IN EDUCATION, SOCIAL SERVICES AND SIMILAR CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES AMONGST THOSE CLASSES IN NEED THEREOF
Area of benefit
WORCESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Evesham Volunteer Centre
Brick Kiln Street
EVESHAM
WR11 4AA
- Phone:
- 0138640165
- Email:
- co@eveshamvolunteers.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window