SHAKERLEY COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY PROVIDES AND MANAGES A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND CAFE IN ORDER TO PROVIDE A MEETING PLACE FOR ALL USER GROUPS WITHIN SHAKERLEY AND SURROUNDING AREAS. IT'S OBJECTS ARE TO IMPROVE THE LIFE OF THE COMMUNITY BY PROVIDING FACILITIES AND RESOURCES THAT ENHANCE THE EDUCATION, SOCIAL WELFARE AND LEISURE ACTIVITIES WITHIN THE COMMUNITY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £6,500 from 3 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Wigan
Governance
- 26 April 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARJORIE MARSDEN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Graham Michael Ridge | Trustee | 23 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Norman Meredith | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Hal Thomas Eccles | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Ellen Eastoe | Trustee | 17 July 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.94k | £14.62k | £9.21k | £27.59k | £43.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.00k | £11.46k | £15.47k | £25.78k | £42.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.00k | N/A | £2.80k | £6.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 February 2025 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 February 2025 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 February 2025 | 371 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 February 2025 | 371 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2022 | 326 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 July 2021 | 157 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 OCTOBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE NEIGHBOURHOOD IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF THE COMMUNITY
Area of benefit
GREATER MANCHESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Cumberland Avenue
Shakerley Community Centre
Tyldesley
M29 8FU
- Phone:
- 01942 874403
- Email:
- enquiries.scp@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window