LEADING YOUR CHURCH INTO GROWTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Offer National conferences for clergy and Resources and Materials for Growing Churches
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 June 2004: Standard registration
- LYCIG (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ven Robert William Jackson | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Tracey Lynne White | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Jane Elizabeth Adams | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Venerable Rhiannon King | Trustee | 11 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Venerable Paul Ayers | Trustee | 18 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev NEIL SHORT | Trustee | 24 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.27k | £30.90k | £76.26k | £67.08k | £86.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.74k | £37.91k | £91.01k | £79.47k | £89.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 25 January 2023 | 117 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 25 January 2023 | 117 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 09 November 2021 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 09 November 2021 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 APRIL 2004.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE EDUCATION AND TRAINING TO CLERGY AND LAITY IN CHURCH GROWTH
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 BAKER STREET
BRADFORD
BD2 4NU
- Phone:
- 07748943541
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window