THE CORONERS' COURTS SUPPORT SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Coroners' Courts Support Service supports practically & emotionally the families and other witnesses attending The Coroner's Courts, thereby making the experience less onerous. The charity liases with other parties appearing before the court to ensure their understanding of its role & methodology. Families are referred to other agencies for help with coming to terms with their bereavement.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £155,648 from 44 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
361 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 15 September 2004: Standard registration
- THE CORONER'S COURT SUPPORT SERVICE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rosemary Burden | Trustee | 04 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kim Elizabeth Chudley | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wai Hang Lau | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr CHRISTOPHER PEAKER | Trustee | 10 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
NICOLAS GIBBON | Trustee | 12 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
MS MAGGIE FROST | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £442.09k | £475.71k | £275.15k | £253.61k | £220.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £419.60k | £303.75k | £346.25k | £405.89k | £299.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £140.70k | £157.05k | £157.52k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £48.34k | N/A | N/A | £155.65k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02 SEP 2004 AS AMENDED ON 28 APR 2009 AS AMENDED ON 04 MAR 2011 AS AMENDED ON 10 SEP 2013 as amended on 15 Oct 2019 as amended on 15 Oct 2019 as amended on 25 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FOR THE RELIEF OF FAMILY AND/OR WITNESSES WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS AND SUFFERING BEREAVEMENT AND/OR TRAUMA BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, GUIDANCE AND SUPPORT IN CONNECTION WITH THE CORONER'S COURT AND ITS PROCESSES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE WESTMINSTER, SOUTHWARK, ST PANCRAS, HAMMERSMITH & FULHAM, CROYDON, EAST LONDON, NORTH LONDON AND CITY OF LONDON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Westminster Coroner's Court
33 Tachbrook Street
Pimlico
LONDON
SW1V 2JR
- Phone:
- 07836737432
- Email:
- info@ccsupport.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window