FRIENDS OF BRADFORD ART GALLERIES AND MUSEUMS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Encourage and promote the education of the people of Bradford in the appreciation of history culture art science and architecture with reference to the activities of public museums maintained by the city. To provide money for the purchase by the trustees, of articles suitable for exhibitions or inclusion in the permanent collections of the museums.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Bradford City
Governance
- 14 March 2005: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gavin Edwards | Chair | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Letitia Anne Lawson | Trustee | 25 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Karen Joy Thomas | Trustee | 14 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ingrid Sandra Dzerins | Trustee | 23 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Linda Joyce Bower | Trustee | 22 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID WATERMAN POWELL | Trustee | 25 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE HALSALL | Trustee | 28 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Derek Barker | Trustee | 18 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
SUE MACINTOSH | Trustee | 10 May 2009 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN WOOLLEY | Trustee | 14 March 2005 |
|
|
||||
SUZANNE Elizabeth RENNIE | Trustee | 14 March 2005 |
|
|
||||
IRENE Jannifer Rolph COAST | Trustee | 14 March 2005 |
|
|
||||
Mohinder Singh Chana | Trustee | 14 March 2005 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.95k | £9.84k | £3.95k | £6.71k | £9.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.94k | £7.70k | £5.86k | £9.75k | £7.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 FEBRUARY 2005
Charitable objects
TO ENCOURAGE PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE AREA OF THE CITY OF BRADFORD METROPOLITAN DISTRICT COUNCIL IN THE APPRECIATION OF HISTORY, CULTURE, ART, SCIENCE, TECHNOLOGY AND ARCHITECTURE WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE ACTIVITIES OF PUBLIC MUSEUMS AND GALLERIES MAINTAINED BY THE SAID BRADFORD METROPOLITAN DISTRICT COUNCIL AND FOR SUCH OTHER LEGALLY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME BY DEED OR DEEDS EXECUTED WITH THEIR UNANIMOUS CONSENT DECLARE
Area of benefit
BRADFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cartwright Hall Art Gallery
Lister Park
BRADFORD
West Yorkshire
BD9 4NS
- Phone:
- 01274431212
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window