Financial history DORSET OPERA

Charity Number: 1105318
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £147.48k £436.60k £651.97k £653.77k £822.32k
Total expenditure £111.62k £466.66k £621.62k £663.95k £837.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £180.01k £139.09k £225.15k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £11.60k £6.16k £8.91k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £319.78k £350.28k £380.10k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £1.12k £6.24k £11.43k
Income - Other N/A N/A £139.46k £152.00k £196.73k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £611.38k £659.86k £830.50k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £10.23k £4.09k £6.75k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £2.27k £2.35k £2.51k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0