Financial history OHR HATORAH

Charity Number: 1105253
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £7.80k £3.77k £2.99k £4.03k £2.60k
Total expenditure £7.01k £2.40k £1.88k £1.47k £914
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A