Financial history DERBYSHIRE AUTISM SERVICES

Charity Number: 1105525
Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £492.48k £478.96k £479.90k £465.45k £771.97k
Total expenditure £526.19k £512.81k £431.99k £468.01k £778.99k
Income from government contracts £11.56k £106.63k £106.63k £238.17k £414.49k
Income from government grants £26.08k £26.08k £26.08k N/A £357.48k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.08k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £388.13k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £23.83k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.25k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £355.69k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £675.70k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £34.29k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £69.01k