Accounts and annual returns CASTLE SCHOOL FRIENDS

Charity Number: 1105569
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 14 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 May 2021 92 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 03 May 2021 92 days late Download Open in new window