HOME-START DAVENTRY AND SOUTH NORTHANTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Volunteer support for young families who are experiencing difficult and stressful situations. Our Volunteers who are parents themselves, visit families in their own home once a week and offer friendship, support and practical help. All families supported by the charity must have at least one child under five years of age and live in one of the two districts of Daventry and South Northants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £18,793 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 10 September 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nonzukiso Lark Mbebe | Trustee | 02 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Lofts | Trustee | 22 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Peter Jacob | Trustee | 24 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lord Boswell of Aynho Timothy Eric Boswell | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Lucinda Mackay | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Caroline Neale | Trustee | 12 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Maria Donna Taylor | Trustee | 22 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Denise Suzanne Jones | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Wingerath | Trustee | 17 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
RUTH MARGARET SCOTT CURZON | Trustee | 28 April 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £97.45k | £277.13k | £148.75k | £147.89k | £70.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £128.01k | £181.84k | £162.54k | £132.93k | £98.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £8.47k | £11.22k | £18.79k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 20 JUN 2023
Charitable objects
A) TO SAFEGUARD, PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL OF CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN; B) TO PREVENT CRUELTY TO OR MALTREATMENT OF CHILDREN C) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, POVERTY AND NEED AMONGST CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN; D) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BETTER STANDARDS OF CHILDCARE.
Area of benefit
NORTHAMPTONSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
HSDSN
PO Box 7950
TOWCESTER
NN12 9BZ
- Phone:
- 01327353139
- Email:
- admin@homestart-davsn.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window