THE ROYAL MASONIC SCHOOL FOR GIRLS BURSARY FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity provides bursaries for the benefit of any pupil,former pupil and/or potential pupil of the Royal Masonic School for Girls who in the opinion of the trustees requires financial assistance to assist in the furtherance or completion of their education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 28 September 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Garvey | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Ian Williams | Trustee | 02 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Staite | Trustee | 24 May 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £222.59k | £124.73k | £95.47k | £74.27k | £99.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.98k | £60.93k | £38.18k | £26.08k | £27.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 05 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 05 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 14 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 14 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 28 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 28 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 5 MAY 2004
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A FUND TO PROVIDE BURSARIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANY PUPIL, FORMER PUPIL AND/OR POTENTIAL PUPIL OF THE SCHOOL WHO IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES REQUIRES FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ASSIST IN THE FURTHERANCE OR COMPLETION OF SUCH PUPIL'S, FORMER PUPIL'S AND/OR POTENTIAL PUPIL'S EDUCATION SUCH BURSARIES TO BE AWARDED IN SUCH A MANNER AND UPON SUCH TERMS AND FROM ALL OR ANY PART OF THE CAPITAL OR INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DECIDE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE ROYAL MASONIC SCHOOL FOR GIRLS
RICKMANSWORTH PARK
RICKMANSWORTH
WD3 4HF
- Phone:
- 01923725306
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window