TRUST FOR LONDON TRUSTEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a charitable organisation that exists to tackle poverty and inequality in London. We do this by funding the voluntary and community sector and others, as well as by using our expertise and knowledge to support work that tackles poverty and its root causes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 08 December 2004: Standard registration
- CITY PAROCHIAL FOUNDATION TRUSTEE (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Omar Hanif Khan | Chair | 09 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Precious Mutsa Sithole | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Rosemary Hewat | Trustee | 22 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Andrew Beal | Trustee | 08 December 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Nicholas James Peters | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
DENISE NICOLE JOSEPH | Trustee | 26 March 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Andrew Charles Brown | Trustee | 26 June 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Alexandra Bryony Carron Doyle | Trustee | 20 March 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Gehanjalie Rosemarie Paul | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Meredith Niles | Trustee | 28 March 2017 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
STEPHEN ERIC BURNS | Trustee | 30 March 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 13 OCTOBER 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 9 FEBRUARY 2007,20 JUNE 2008 AND 27 MARCH 2009; AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION ADOPTED 26 MARCH 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28 SEP 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 JAN 2018
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES INCLUDING, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING: A. ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES OTHER THAN THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION WHICH ARE DIRECTED TO THE BENEFIT OF POOR INHABITANTS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT; AND B. THE REPAIR, RESTORATION OR PRESERVATION OF THE FABRIC AND CONTENTS OF CHURCHES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AND THE MAINTENANCE OF SERVICES THEREIN, THE MAINTENANCE OF THE FABRIC OF THE CHURCHES, THE AUGMENTATION OF CLERICAL STIPENDS, THE GIVING OF THEOLOGICAL INSTRUCTION TO PERSONS PREPARING FOR HOLY ORDERS, OR OTHERWISE EXTENDING THE BENEFIT OF CLERICAL OR SPIRITUAL MINISTRATIONS IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES OR BY THE MINISTERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AS BY LAW ESTABLISHED, IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. THE AREA OF BENEFIT IS THE AREA WITHIN THE BOUNDARIES OF THE METROPOLITAN POLICE DISTRICT AS CONSTITUTED ON 18 APRIL 1989.
Area of benefit
THE AREA OF BENEFIT IS THE AREA WITHIN THE BOUNDARIES OF THE METROPOLITAN POLICE DISTRICT AS CONSTITUTED ON 18 APRIL 1989.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Trust for London
4 Chiswell Street
LONDON
EC1Y 4UP
- Phone:
- 02076066145
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window