FRIENDS OF CARMARTHEN COUNTY MUSEUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RAISES FUNDS TO BUY OBJECTS OF INTEREST FOR THE CARMARTHEN MUSEUM. ALSO HELPS SUPPORT CHILDREN'S ACTIVITIES DURING THE SCHOOL HOLIDAYS. FUND RAISING ACTIVITIES INCLUDE A CHRISTMAS CONCERT AND AN ANNUAL QUIZ.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Carmarthenshire
Governance
- 14 March 2005: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Linda Jones | Chair | 15 May 2014 |
|
|||||
Carole Jones | Trustee | 14 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carole Ann Edmunds | Trustee | 23 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bethan Edwards | Trustee | 21 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ann Lewis | Trustee | 21 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr MARY THORLEY | Trustee | 26 May 2017 |
|
|||||
Ann Davies | Trustee | 15 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Wynne Jones | Trustee | 15 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Ann Evans | Trustee | 15 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.53k | £1.18k | £812 | £645 | £175 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.25k | £1.00k | £25 | £1.29k | £465 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 12 December 2024 | 287 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 09 May 2023 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 10 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 23 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 MAY 1990 AS AMENDED 24 JUNE 1993, 01 JULY 1998, 12 MAY 1999 AND 16 FEBRUARY 2005
Charitable objects
THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTION, SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF CARMARTHEN COUNTY MUSEUM IN CO-OPERATION WITH ITS MANAGEMENT AND STAFF.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE CARMARTHENSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FRIENDS OF CARMARTHEN COUNTY MUSEUM
CARMARTHEN COUNTY MUSEUM
ABERGWILI
CARMARTHEN
SA31 2JG
- Phone:
- 01267 228696
- Email:
- fmuseum07@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window