Financial history CONNOR DOWNS RESIDENTS' ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1108024
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024 31/03/2025
Total gross income £885 £2.54k £5.81k £17.44k £23.30k
Total expenditure £1.41k £2.07k £6.23k £16.51k £24.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £17.74k