Magenta Living

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide social housing to those who are unable to meet their own housing costs in the open market.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£77,224,000
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £71.68m | |
Other trading activities | £4.39m | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £1.15m |
Total expenditure:
£72,285,000
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £70.86m | |
Other | £1.43m |
£460,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £4,412,700 from 70 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.43m | |
Charitable expenditure | £70.86m | |
Retained for future use | £4.94m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.43m | |
Charitable expenditure | £70.86m | |
Retained for future use | £5.40m |
People

587 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 39 |
£70k to £80k | 19 |
£80k to £90k | 4 |
£90k to £100k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 6 |
£110k to £120k | 2 |
£120k to £130k | 2 |
£130k to £140k | 2 |
£150k to £200k | 3 |
£200k to £250k | 1 |
£250k to £300k | 1 |
One or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Wirral
Governance
- 24 November 2004: Standard registration
- MAGENTA LIVING (Working name)
- WIRRAL PARTNERSHIP HOMES (Working name)
- WPH (Working name)
- WIRRAL PARTNERSHIP HOMES LIMITED (Previous name)
- Homes England
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gerard Lucas | Chair | 23 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Patrick Nelson Chapman | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Mary O'Doherty | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Elizabeth Barber | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Andrew Richards | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Robert Allcock | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Lee Riley | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Liam Garth Christey Kelly | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Myles Jonathan Edwards | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Ann-Louise Gilmore | Trustee | 12 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.73m | £69.59m | £73.90m | £69.60m | £77.22m | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.99m | £59.59m | £63.37m | £70.52m | £72.29m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.40m | £2.40m | £2.84m | £2.42m | £4.41m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £507.00k | £2.42m | £1.81m | £1.84m | £4.39m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £60.54m | £62.38m | £63.49m | £66.31m | £71.68m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £4.68m | £4.79m | £8.60m | £1.46m | £1.15m | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £61.38m | £59.04m | £62.88m | £69.94m | £70.86m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £16.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £585.00k | £550.00k | £491.00k | £576.00k | £1.43m |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £229.34m | £232.74m | £236.10m | £249.91m | £272.34m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £669.00k | £620.00k | £660.00k | £90.00k | |
|
Other assets | £27.32m | £26.53m | £34.89m | £24.91m | £17.72m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £20.98m | -£31.54m | -£23.33m | £6.92m | £6.61m | |
|
Total liabilities | £120.17m | £116.43m | £132.38m | £133.34m | £145.18m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/09/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/11/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/09/2008 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 17/08/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 SEP 2016 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01 OCT 2016 AS AMENDED ON 12 APR 2019 AS AMENDED ON 12 APR 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 MAR 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY SHALL BE: (1) TO PROVIDE HOUSES OR HOSTELS INCLUDING SOCIAL HOUSING AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES FOR PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS; (2) TO PROVIDE FOR AGED, DISABLED OR CHRONICALLY SICK PERSONS IN NEED THEREOF HOUSES OR HOSTELS INCLUDING SOCIAL HOUSING AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED TO MEET THE DISABILITIES AND REQUIREMENTS OF SUCH PERSONS; (3) TO PROVIDE SERVICES, ADVICE OR ASSISTANCE UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS TO AGED, DISABLED, OR CHRONICALLY SICK PERSONS IN NEED THEREOF AND PROVIDE ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED TO MEET THE DISABILITIES AND REQUIREMENTS OF SUCH PERSONS; (4) TO PROVIDE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS OF THE LOCAL AUTHORITY AREAS IN WHICH THE COMPANY OWNS OR MANAGES HOUSING STOCK; (5) TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONGST RESIDENTS OF THE LOCAL AUTHORITY AREAS IN WHICH THE COMPANY OWNS OR MANAGES HOUSING STOCK; (6) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE; (7) TO MAINTAIN, IMPROVE OR PROVIDE PUBLIC AMENITIES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE INTERESTS OF REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION IN WHICH THE COMPANY OWNS OR MANAGES HOUSING STOCK.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONALLY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Magenta Living
Partnership Building
Hamilton Street
Birkenhead
CH41 5AA
- Phone:
- 0800 100 9596
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window