CHINA OXFORD SCHOLARSHIP FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the education of persons ordinarily resident in Greater China who are or will be attending courses at the University of Oxford.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Oxfordshire
- China
Governance
- 09 December 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICHOLAS CHARLES JONATHAN DENNYS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
XIAODI BELL | Trustee | 23 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
SIR EDWARD HENRY GARNIER | Trustee | 23 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dyan Sterling | Trustee | 13 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR CUI ZHANFENG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNE LINDSAY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.89k | £22.18k | £23.43k | £22.94k | £22.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.71k | £64.16k | £70.03k | £66.03k | £64.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 20 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 12 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 09 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 09 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 15 SEPTEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED 27 APRIL 2005 AND 02 AUGUST 2005.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS ORDINARILY RESIDENT IN GREATER CHINA WHO ARE OR WILL BE ATTENDING COURSES AT THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD (OR, IN THE EVENT THAT THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD IS DISSOLVED, AT OTHER INSTITUTIONS OF HIGHER EDUCATION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM).
Area of benefit
GREATER CHINA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Harrison Beale & Owen
Highdown House
11 Highdown Road
Leamington Spa
CV31 1XT
- Phone:
- 01926422292
- Email:
- info@chinaoxford.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window