GODOLPHIN AND LATYMER SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The PTFA advances the education of pupils in the school by developing effective relationships between staff Parents and others associated with the school, and by engaging in activities which support the school and advance the education of the pupils.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 10 December 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Frances Ramsey | Chair | 13 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Anne Bassis | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bukie Hove | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Monique Macbeth | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Elisabeth Westin | Trustee | 08 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Jane Freudenheim | Trustee | 08 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Price | Trustee | 08 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jade Smart | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jamie Carter | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Lloyd | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.28k | £20.62k | £17.19k | £36.85k | £144.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.51k | £24.84k | £27.73k | £24.48k | £143.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06/05/2004 AS AMENDED ON 10/09/2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL OR TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 1. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
GODOLPHIN & LATYMER SCHOOL
IFFLEY ROAD
LONDON
W6 0PG
- Phone:
- 020 8741 1936
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window