BOLTON COUNCIL OF MOSQUES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Islamic religion by encouraging the establishing and maintenance of Mosques. The promotion of racial and religious harmony between Muslims and non-Muslims in order to foster mutual understanding and toleration. The promotion of such other charitable purposes particular for the benefit of the Muslim Community as the trustees think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £31,852 from 5 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bolton
Governance
- 03 May 2006: Standard registration
- BCOM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
abdul wajid khan | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|||||
asif patel | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|||||
Faisal Rai | Trustee | 12 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
imteyaz ali | Trustee | 01 January 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £135.35k | £421.65k | £489.21k | £354.55k | £338.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £161.01k | £399.18k | £326.67k | £328.49k | £362.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £87.87k | £136.96k | £52.10k | £16.47k | £31.85k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 July 2024 | 180 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 July 2024 | 180 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 April 2023 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 April 2023 | 77 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 April 2022 | 80 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 April 2022 | 80 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 FEBRUARY 2004 AS AMENDED AT A SPECIAL GENERAL MEETING ON 21 DECEMBER 2005.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE BCOM SHALL BE PRIMARILY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF BOLTON BOROUGH AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF: (1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC RELIGION, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY ENCOURAGING THE ESTABLISHING AND MAINTENANCE OF MOSQUES AND PURSUING THE IMPROVED DELIVERY OF THEIR SERVICES TO THE PUBLIC. (2) THE PROMOTION OF RACIAL AND RELIGIOUS HARMONY BETWEEN MUSLIMS AND NON-MUSLIMS IN ORDER TO FOSTER MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND TOLERATION. (3) THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE A NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL; CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. (4) THE ESTABLISHING OF AN ISLAMIC COMMUNITY ORGANISATION AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME, (WHETHER ALONE, OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSONS OR BODY) IN ENHANCEMENT OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS. (5) THE PROMOTION OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES PARTICULARLY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
BOLTON BOROUGH AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bolton Council of Mosques
1 Vicarage Street
BOLTON
BL3 5LE
- Phone:
- 07877445047
- Email:
- admin@thebcom.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window