THE RACING CENTRE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of a club and youth centre and other facilities to benefit persons employed in and about the stables and training establishments in Newmarket Suffolk; in the interests of Social Welfare with the objective of improving the condition of life for such persons being persons who by reason of their poverty or social and economic circumstances have need for such facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £901 from 2 government contract(s) and £10,340 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Suffolk
Governance
- 27 January 2005: Standard registration
- THE RACING CENTRE (Working name)
- THE NEW ASTLEY CLUB (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Fanshawe | Trustee | 13 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Prior | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Anthony John Beazley | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Simon Bailey | Trustee | 22 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE MCGRATH | Trustee | 22 January 2014 |
|
|||||
HONOURABLE PETER HUGH CHARLES STANLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £341.24k | £510.71k | £283.03k | £241.86k | £241.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £331.03k | £330.91k | £362.39k | £405.38k | £312.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £360 | N/A | £901 | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | £81.13k | £38.94k | £9.40k | £10.34k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £421.04k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £36.14k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £12.26k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £41.27k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £330.91k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £28.14k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 February 2023 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 February 2023 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 NOVEMBER 2004. AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19 MAY 2014
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH AN ORGANISATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS EMPLOYED IN AND ABOUT THE STABLES AND RACING AND TRAINING ESTABLISHMENTS IN NEWMARKET AND ELSEWHERE BY THE PROVISION OF A CLUB AND YOUTH CENTRE AND OTHER FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND A LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE FOR SUCH PERSONS BEING PERSONS WHO BY REASON OF THEIR POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES AND SUBJECT THERETO FOR THE USE OF SUCH OTHER RESIDENTS OF THE TOWN OF NEWMARKET WHO FOR LIKE REASONS HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
NEWMARKET AND ELSEWHERE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Racing Centre
Fred Archer Way
NEWMARKET
CB8 8NT
- Phone:
- 01638662828
- Email:
- info@theracingcentre.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window