SAFETY NET - KEEPING CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND FAMILIES SAFE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work with communities across Brighton, Hove and Sussex to keep children safe. We support families with parenting issues and provide home safety equipment, we work to prevent bullying and involve children in community safety issues; provide safeguarding support for community groups and a CRB checking service. We use a safety awareness programme called Protective Behaviours to support this work
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Total income includes £70,000 from 2 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 31 March 2005: Standard registration
- 03 October 2023: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 03 October 2023: Funds transferred to 276669 IMPACT INITIATIVES
- SAFETY NET (Working name)
- SAFETY NET KEEPING CHILDREN SAFE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £303.73k | £268.82k | £246.25k | £240.88k | £193.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £329.03k | £280.08k | £266.08k | £262.12k | £229.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £82.66k | £91.50k | £80.00k | £82.39k | £70.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13/05/2015 as amended on 24 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF WELL-BEING, PERSONAL SAFETY AND PROTECTIVE BEHAVIOURS 2. TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS 3. TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE CHILDREN AND FAMILIES OF THE DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES OF ENGLAND IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY AND HELP MEET THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY
Area of benefit
ENGLAND.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window