DECIBELS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
DECIBELS HAS ESTABLISHED A LEARNING UNIT ON A UNIVERSITY CAMPUS FOR THE DEVELOPMENT AND USE OF SOUND,MUSIC,THE ARTS,PERFORMANCE AND TECHNOLOGY.THE LATEST RESEARCH ICT (INFORMATION & COMMUNICATIONS TECHNOLOGY) MODULES ARE "VISUAL MUSIC" AND "RHYTHM OF SILENCE" AND THEY ARE BEING USED BY DEAFAX,TEACHERS,PARENTS,STUDENTS,AND WITH CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH A VARIETY OF DISABILITIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 April 2005: Standard registration
- 12 March 2024: Funds received from 1082934 THE MOLLY FORSTER CHARITABLE TRUST
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William Philip Ogden | Trustee | 29 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rosie Axon | Trustee | 10 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
PAUL ANDREW TOWNSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.12k | £34.96k | £33.00k | £26.40k | £46.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.48k | £14.93k | £18.00k | £16.41k | £18.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 DECEMBER 2004, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 15 MARCH 2005.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF PEOPLE WITH A VARIETY OF DISABILITIES FOR THE PURPOSES OF ENABLING THEM TO LEARN, APPRECIATE AND ENJOY SOUND, MUSIC, PERFORMANCE AND THE ARTS THROUGH THE USE OF TECHNOLOGY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
DECIBELS
121 GREYS ROAD
HENLEY-ON-THAMES
OXFORDSHIRE
RG9 1TE
- Phone:
- 01491 576281
- Email:
- ken.carter@decibels.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window