MELTING POT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
LUNCHEON CLUB FOR AFRICAN CARIBBEAN SENIORS, DEVELOPMENT WORK TO CO-ORDINATOR FOR ALL ACTIVITIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2017
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Redbridge
Governance
- 03 May 2005: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NOEL MURRAY | Trustee | 30 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA BYER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GLORIA LEONIE BYER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2013 | 28/02/2014 | 28/02/2015 | 28/02/2016 | 28/02/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.27k | £5.98k | £0 | £797 | £904 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.55k | £6.54k | £0 | £555 | £360 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 128 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 128 days | |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 495 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 495 days | |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 860 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 860 days | |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1225 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1225 days | |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1589 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1589 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 MARCH 2004, AS AMENDED 8 APRIL 2005
Charitable objects
1. TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF THE AFRICAN CARIBBEAN COMMUNITY (HEREAFTER REFERRED TO AS THE BENEFICIARIES) IN REDBRIDGE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY PROVIDING INFORMATION AND ADVICE. 2. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE BENEFICIARIES WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 3. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY PROVIDING ARE AND CRAFT WORKSHOPS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN SINGING, DANCING AND DRAMA.
Area of benefit
REDBRIDGE AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O CARDINAL HEENAN CENTRE
326 HIGH ROAD
ILFORD
ESSEX
IG1 1QP
- Phone:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window