Trustees SWANSEA CARERS' CENTRE
Charity number: 1108865

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeffrey Pulman | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Price | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Davidson | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|||||
BYRON FUSSELL | Trustee | 22 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sue Davies | Trustee | 21 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
SONIA THOMAS | Trustee | 03 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
GILL STEVENS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT BRYN WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID ALBERT BURGESS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.