SAMUEL LITHGOW YOUTH CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Samuel Lithgow Youth Centre's main services target disadvantaged young people aged 5 to 19 years old through two different youth projects and an after school club, but we also offer supporting activities to lone parents and under 5's, local students, BME groups, women, and senior citizens.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £72,960 from 3 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Camden
Governance
- SAMUAL LITHGOW YOUTH CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fadumo Mohammad | Trustee | 25 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Maria Reguenga | Trustee | 30 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joao ANtunes Felicio | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophia Dominique Shaw | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fatoumata Diallo | Trustee | 01 February 2017 |
|
|||||
PETER JOHN SCOREY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £163.52k | £122.64k | £149.21k | £154.32k | £194.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £164.41k | £151.17k | £159.38k | £171.37k | £188.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £61.61k | £46.53k | £85.04k | £76.70k | £72.96k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2021
(These accounts |
06 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 FEBRUARY 2005 AS AMENDED 29 JANUARY 2008.
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE PERSONAL AND SOCIAL EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY THOSE IN POOR CIRCUMSTANCES IN OR NEAR THE LONDON BOROUGH OF CAMDEN. THIS SHALL BE DONE THROUGH PROGRAMMES OF SOCIAL, CULTURAL, PHYSICAL AND RECREATIONAL PURSUITS TO ENABLE THEM TO DEVELOP A RANGE OF SOCIAL AND LIFE SKILLS SO THAT THEY MAY BEHAVE AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS. B) AT SUCH TIMES AS THE COMPANY'S PREMISES ARE NOT BEING USED TO FURTHER THE OBJECTS SET OUT IN (A): (1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, ESPECIALLY THOSE LIVING IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF CAMDEN, BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR AND TRAINING IN SPECIFIC SKILLS SUCH AS INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY AND ASSERTIVENESS (2) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC, ESPECIALLY THOSE LIVING IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF CAMDEN, FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Samuel Lithgow Youth Centre
69-75 Stanhope Street
LONDON
NW1 3LD
- Phone:
- 02076920186
- Website:
-
WWW.samuel-lithgow.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window