Financial history ARTVENTURE TRUST LIMITED

Charity Number: 1109302
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £69.16k £74.18k £82.57k £98.71k £137.97k
Total expenditure £67.83k £69.75k £77.85k £100.13k £144.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £17.29k
Income from government grants £6.98k £7.19k £5.28k £2.82k £34.47k