ANGELS OF THE NORTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of the poor and needy or such other charitable purposes as the club shall in duly constituted meeting from time to time direct.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2019
People

12 Trustee(s)
107 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
- Bangladesh
- India
- Kenya
- Nepal
- Nigeria
- Pakistan
- Uganda
Governance
- 14 April 2005: Standard registration
- THE REVEREND FATHERS DICK AND TOM CASS MEMORIAL FUND (Working name)
- THE ROTARY CLUB OF MONKSEATON CENTENARY TRUST FUND (Previous name)
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr HARI SHUKLA OBE | Chair | 21 November 2012 |
|
|
||||||
Nitin Shukla | Trustee | 15 February 2013 |
|
|||||||
TAHIR RASHID | Trustee | 21 November 2012 |
|
|||||||
DR RAM REDDY | Trustee | 21 November 2012 |
|
|
||||||
STEPHANE BOMMEL | Trustee | 21 November 2012 |
|
|
||||||
PAUL EZHILCHELVAN | Trustee | 21 November 2012 |
|
|
||||||
GARY STAKER | Trustee | 21 November 2012 |
|
|
||||||
SHARON BROWN | Trustee | 21 November 2012 |
|
|
||||||
ANDREA TAYLOR | Trustee | 30 November 2011 |
|
|
||||||
MR VISHWANATH PULLE | Trustee | 05 September 2011 |
|
|
||||||
TRACEY HARTLEY | Trustee | 02 April 2011 |
|
|
||||||
ALBERT WHITING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2015 | 30/06/2016 | 30/06/2017 | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.77k | £30.14k | £6.90k | £8.07k | £32.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.80k | £28.51k | £9.85k | £4.60k | £33.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Annual return not yet received | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Accounts not yet received | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 365 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 365 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 731 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 731 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1096 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1096 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1461 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 02/03/2005 AS AMENDED ON 23/11/2011 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 09/03/2012
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT AND IN PARTICULAR- (1) THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF WAR, OR NATURAL OR CIVIL DISASTER, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL AID FOR PERSONS, BODIES, ORGANISATIONS AND/OR COUNTRIES AFFECTED. (2) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, OF PEOPLE LIVING IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, GOODS OR SERVICES FOR PERSONS, BODIES, ORGANISATIONS AND/OR COUNTRIES AFFECTED. (3) TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES WITHIN THE UK OR WITHIN ANY OTHER COUNTRY IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY. (4) THE RELIEF, TREATMENT AND CARE OF PERSONS IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD SUFFERING FROM MENTAL OR PHYSICAL INCAPACITY, INCLUDING THE EFFECTS OF OLD AGE, OF ANY DESCRIPTION OR IN NEED OF REHABILITATION AS A RESULT OF SUCH INCAPACITY, BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, GOODS OR SERVICES. (5) TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY RELIEVING NEED AMONG THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE. (6) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF BIODIVERSITY AND THE ENVIRONMENT IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS FOR COMMUNITIES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD. (7) TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION. SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT MEANS "DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS". (8) THE PROMOTION OF ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ANGELS OF THE NORTH
75 MARINE AVENUE
WHITLEY BAY
TYNE & WEAR
NE26 1NB
- Phone:
- 01912531937
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window