NEW EURASIA STRATEGIES CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main activity of the charity is to advance education in the Russian Federation through the provision of scholarships to students and the making of donations to educational establishments. The charity focuses on grants to Russian universities for the provision of scholarships and the distribution of English language academic books to Russian universities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 April 2005: Standard registration
- OXFORD RUSSIA FUND (Previous name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vladimir Pastukhov | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gleb Khodorkovsky | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Tulloch | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.79m | £186.21k | £9.65k | £4.54k | £2.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.79m | £139.22k | £2.58k | £1.75k | £13.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.79m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £2 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.79m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £7.05k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £1.93m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 16 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 JANUARY 2005. as amended on 11 Nov 2022 as amended on 12 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE RUSSIAN FEDERATION AND THE UNITED KINGDOM THROUGH, INTER ALIA, THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS TO STUDENTS AND THE MAKING OF DONATIONS TO EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS AND TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE NOW OR MAY HEREAFTER BE DEEMED BY ENGLISH LAW TO BE CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
THE RUSSIAN FEDERATION AND THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
TULLOCH & CO
4 HILL STREET
LONDON
W1J 5NE
- Phone:
- 02073181180
- Email:
- atulloch@atulloch.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window