GOOD OLD FURNITURE AVAILABLE (GOFA)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of poverty to people in receipt of benefit within the district of Penwith Cornwall via the provision of household goods.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £10,856 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
Governance
- 06 June 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Andrew Robert McKenna | Trustee | 03 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Norman Robson | Trustee | 13 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Kirsty Murray-Lambrou | Trustee | 02 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Janet Ballett | Trustee | 02 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Caroline Newborn | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
David Felce | Trustee | 13 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
Penelope Young | Trustee | 26 January 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
DANIEL RUBENS | Trustee | 03 January 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
CLIVE HARROLD | Trustee | 04 January 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.63k | £79.42k | £107.34k | £137.90k | £107.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £80.89k | £78.18k | £91.94k | £121.20k | £126.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £24.00k | N/A | N/A | £10.86k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 03 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 03 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 13 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 13 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 11 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 11 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 MARCH 2005,
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF HOUSEHOLD FURNITURE AND GOODS TO THOSE PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH ITEMS BY REASON OF THEIR NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES. 2. ADVANCE EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING PARTICULAR AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE SO AS TO DEVELOP WORK SKILLS, GAIN WORK EXPERIENCE AND ENCOURAGE SOCIAL INTEGRATION; AND 3. PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE ENVIRONMENT BY EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN THE BENEFITS TO THE ENVIRONMENT OF SUSTAINABLE WASTE MANAGEMENT PRACTICES INCLUDING RECYCLING, CARRYING OUT RESEARCH INTO SUSTAINABLE WASTE MANAGEMENT PRACTICES AND DISSEMINATING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
G O F A
Ellis Square
Voundervour Lane
Penzance
TR18 4UH
- Phone:
- 01736369847
- Email:
- graeme@gofa.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window