Financial history RYEDALE COMMUNITY TRANSPORT CIO

Charity number: 1109232
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £431.88k £391.95k £514.48k £521.55k £570.52k
Total expenditure £409.49k £405.90k £466.62k £511.54k £570.97k
Income from government contracts £141.03k £206.14k £220.94k £222.71k £277.43k
Income from government grants £134.05k £112.79k £92.68k £113.48k £132.22k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £21.64k £22.45k £17.98k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £240.06k £238.79k £296.96k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £252.76k £259.59k £253.43k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £13 £725 £2.15k
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £460.16k £506.93k £564.97k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £6.46k £4.61k £6.00k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £4.51k £4.75k £4.44k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0