TRAINING AND RESEARCH GLOBAL EDUCATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity continues to provide funds to schools, colleges, charities and other approved institutions for children and young adults. It continues to spread the power of knowledge and self-reliance through training, education and research. It continues to support a number of community village schools for physically and mentally handicapped pupils and others for improving educational facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- India
Governance
- 24 May 2005: Standard registration
- TARGET (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ina De | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|||||
James Spicer | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
AMIT ABHA DE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANITA DE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
INGRID DE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MIKAEL RABER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £214.25k | £132.28k | £119.80k | £118.73k | £146.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £101.47k | £95.30k | £81.22k | £82.77k | £117.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 23 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 23 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 09 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 09 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 17 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 17 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18 MAY 2005 null
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ESPECIALLY YOUNG PEOPLE IN SUBJECTS RELATED TO MATHEMATICS, FINANCIAL ECONOMICS AND ACTUARIAL TECHNIQUES BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO SCHOOLS, UNIVERSITIES, CHARITIES AND RESEARCH INSTITUTES PARTICULARLY IN INDIA, ENGLAND AND WALES. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUBJECTS RELATED TO PENSION AND DEMOGRAPHY BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO UNIVERSITIES, CHARITIES AND RESEARCH INSTITUTES TO SUPPORT RESEARCH, IN THE AFORESAID AREAS PARTICULARLY IN INDIA, ENGLAND AND WALES. 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND RELIEVE THE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF DISABLED STUDENTS BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO SCHOOLS, UNIVERSITIES, CHARITIES AND RESEARCH INSTITUTES PARTICULARLY IN INDIA, ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
INDIA, ENGLAND AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 MEADOWBANK
LONDON
NW3 3AY
- Phone:
- 02079165118
- Email:
- home@targetcharity.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window