EXETER NETWORK CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote and advance the Christian faith; relieve poverty, hardship, sickness and disease; and promote education and training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 16 May 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julia Elizabeth Jolley | Trustee | 11 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Edward Hingston | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
TOMAS SIMON HUNT | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
PAUL STEPHEN MORRISH | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Jonathon Curtis | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey Neil Tutchings | Trustee | 12 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £346.82k | £412.85k | £432.19k | £350.52k | £468.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £368.00k | £360.26k | £387.76k | £439.72k | £393.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4 NOVEMBER 2004. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19 NOV 2009
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND ALLEVIATE SUFFERING ACCORDING TO THE MISSION OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AND THE VALUES AND TENETS OF THE ANGLICAN COMMUNION SUMMARISED IN RESOLUTION 11 OF THE THIRD LAMBETH CONFERENCE FOLLOWING THE CHICAGO-LAMBETH QUADRILATERAL NAMELY: (I) THE HOLY SCRIPTURE OF THE OLD AND NEW TESTAMENTS, AS 'CONTAINING ALL THINGS NECESSARY TO SALVATION,' AND AS BEING THE RULE AND ULTIMATE STANDARD OF FAITH; (II) THE APOSTLES CREED, AS THE BAPTISMAL SYMBOL; AND THE NICENE CREED, AS THE SUFFICIENT STATEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH; (III) THE TWO SACRAMENTS ORDAINED BY CHRIST HIMSELF - BAPTISM AND THE SUPPER OF THE LORD - MINISTERED WITH UNFAILING USE OF CHRIST'S WORDS OF INSTITUTION, AND OF THE ELEMENTS ORDAINED BY HIM; (IV) THE HISTORIC EPISCOPATE, LOCALLY ADAPTED IN THE METHODS OF ITS ADMINISTRATION TO THE VARYING NEEDS TO THE NATIONS AND PEOPLES CALLED OF GOD INTO THE UNITY OF HIS CHURCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE EXETER, DEVON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Exeter Network Church
22 Southernhay West
EXETER
EX1 1PR
- Phone:
- 01392434311
- Email:
- office@enc.uk.net
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window