Financial history PENNY BEALE MEMORIAL FUND

Charity Number: 1110528
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023 30/11/2024
Total gross income £554 £144 £171 £9.02k £351
Total expenditure £354 £1.02k £384 £569 £5.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A