Financial history BOLTON SCHOOL

Charity number: 1110703
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £29.66m £31.29m £34.33m £35.06m £36.64m
Total expenditure £29.50m £29.69m £32.52m £34.64m £36.49m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.19m £659.00k £103.00k £38.00k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.28m £1.32m £2.09m £1.74m £1.71m
Income - Other trading activities £1.35m £506.00k £1.35m £1.22m £1.27m
Income - Charitable activities £25.57m £28.58m £30.53m £31.83m £33.24m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £264.00k £230.00k £258.00k £229.00k £414.00k
Income - Other £1.19m £666.00k £109.00k £40.00k £2.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £50.00k £793.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £26.94m £28.59m £30.79m £32.96m £34.61m
Expenditure - Raising funds £234.00k £208.00k £282.00k £318.00k £590.00k
Expenditure - Governance £44.00k £36.00k £40.00k £46.00k £45.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £2.33m £885.00k £1.44m £1.36m £1.29m