ST MARY'S COLLEGE CROSBY TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity provides educational facilities and training for boys and girls from birth to 18 years of age. In accordance with its status as a Blessed Edmund Rice School the Trustees offer scholarships and bursaries to children whose families would not otherwise be able to afford an education that provides a balanced and integrated development of the true potentials of the whole person.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£9,960,644
Donations and legacies | £20.04k | |
Charitable activities | £9.91m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £32.71k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£9,754,625
Raising funds | £11.47k | |
Charitable activities | £9.74m | |
Other | £0 |
-£3,053 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £11.47k | |
Charitable expenditure | £9.74m | |
Retained for future use | £206.02k |
People

171 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 4 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Knowsley
- Lancashire
- Liverpool City
- Manchester City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Wigan
- Wirral
Governance
- 05 July 2005: Standard registration
- ST. MARY'S COLLEGE CROSBY (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Joseph Cleugh | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leecia Martindale | Trustee | 08 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW SYMONS | Trustee | 08 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Wright | Trustee | 08 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
HELEN THOMPSON | Trustee | 08 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
David McCaughrean | Trustee | 08 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL MCKENNA | Trustee | 08 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Pat Old | Trustee | 08 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA WARD | Trustee | 08 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Stephen Fitzsimons | Trustee | 04 March 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.11m | £6.06m | £7.73m | £8.91m | £9.96m | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.90m | £6.10m | £7.35m | £8.32m | £9.75m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £28.94k | £5.34k | £11.56k | £34.59k | £20.04k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £6.06m | £5.82m | £7.65m | £8.85m | £9.91m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £24.55k | £16.75k | £23.59k | £17.68k | £32.71k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £210.98k | £43.03k | £1.62k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £5.90m | £6.10m | £7.34m | £8.31m | £9.74m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £10.53k | £11.59k | £11.47k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £7.20k | £8.10k | £8.16k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £10.53k | £11.59k | £11.47k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.69m | £2.53m | £2.54m | £2.76m | £2.95m | |
|
Long-term investments | £1.20m | £1.16m | £1.40m | £1.38m | £1.40m | |
|
Other assets | £915.48k | £1.10m | £1.53m | £1.91m | £1.85m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.39m | £1.47m | £1.55m | £1.65m | £1.59m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 07 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 07 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 12 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 12 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4 APRIL 2005
Charitable objects
(I) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AT ST MARY'S COLLEGE, CROSBY IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE SPIRIT AND IDEALS OF BLESSED EDMUND RICE AND (II) TO ADVANCE THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION BY THE CONDUCT OF ROMAN CATHOLIC SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. MARYS COLLEGE
EVEREST ROAD
LIVERPOOL
L23 5TW
- Phone:
- 01519243926
- Email:
- office@stmarys.lpool.sch.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window